NY A07254 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - signed chap.488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to base proportions in assessing units in Nassau county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to base proportions in assessing units in Nassau county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-22Assemblysigned chap.488
2023-09-22Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.1420
2023-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7361
2023-06-01SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-01Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.472
2023-06-01Assemblyrules report cal.472
2023-06-01Assemblyreported
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-16Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S07361 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7254

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A7254
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07254&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07254
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07254&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07254&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07254&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07254&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A7254#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback