NY A07245 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - print number 7245a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - print number 7245a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to preserving access to affordable drugs; provides that an agreement resolving or settling, on a final or interim basis, a patent infringement claim, in connection with the sale of a pharmaceutical product, shall be presumed to have anticompetitive effects if a nonreference drug filer receives anything of value from another company asserting patent infringement and if the nonreference drug filer agrees to limit or forego research, development, manufacturing, marketing, or sales of the nonreference drug filer's product for any period of time.
Title
Relates to preserving access to affordable drugs; provides that an agreement resolving or settling, on a final or interim basis, a patent infringement claim, in connection with the sale of a pharmaceutical product, shall be presumed to have anticompetitive effects if a nonreference drug filer receives anything of value from another company asserting patent infringement and if the nonreference drug filer agrees to limit or forego research, development, manufacturing, marketing, or sales of the nonreference drug filer's product for any period of time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | print number 7245a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04370 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES