NY A07237 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s4375a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - substituted by s4375a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits physicians who are licensed in another state or territory to provide medical services to athletes and team personnel at team sporting events in New York, provided such services are provided only to those athletes and team personnel at the team sporting event.
Title
Permits physicians who are licensed in another state or territory to provide medical services to athletes and team personnel at team sporting events in New York, provided such services are provided only to those athletes and team personnel at the team sporting event.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Victor Pichardo [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Erik Bohen [R] | Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s4375a |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.158 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.158 |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7237b |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | print number 7237a |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04375 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - APPROVAL MEMO.21