NY A07236 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s6426a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-01 - substituted by s6426a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the service provider to successfully complete and submit to the Long Island power authority the results of an annual stress test of all systems that support outage and restoration management and communications; imposes a civil penalty of two hundred fifty thousand dollars for the failure to complete such stress test; makes related provisions.
Title
Requires the service provider to successfully complete and submit to the Long Island power authority the results of an annual stress test of all systems that support outage and restoration management and communications; imposes a civil penalty of two hundred fifty thousand dollars for the failure to complete such stress test; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s6426a |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.228 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | print number 7236a |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06426 (Same As) 2021-12-29 - VETOED MEMO.81