NY A07230 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-8)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-19 - substituted by s5046a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-19 - substituted by s5046a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any municipality from collecting a fine, penalty, forfeiture, or any other fee unless a person charged with a violation of any law, rule, or regulation issued pursuant to the vehicle and traffic law is convicted of or found liable for such charge.
Title
Prohibits any municipality from collecting a fine, penalty, forfeiture, or any other fee unless a person charged with a violation of any law, rule, or regulation issued pursuant to the vehicle and traffic law is convicted of or found liable for such charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5046a |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.709 |
2015-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | print number 7230a |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | reference changed to transportation |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05046 (Same As) 2015-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.32