NY A07230 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s587a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-15 - substituted by s587a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the chancellor of the city school district of a city over 1 million to inventory and report on the outdoor schoolyards of such district.
Title
Directs the chancellor of the city school district of a city over 1 million to inventory and report on the outdoor schoolyards of such district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s587a |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.249 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.249 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | print number 7230a |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2011-04-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00587 (Same As) 2011-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.544