NY A07214 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - approval memo.111
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Facilitates access to telephone providers to deliver fiber-based services; permits telephone corporations to replace or supplement a telephone line or portion of a line with fiber optic facilities for purposes of providing any telephone, broadband, cable or other video service that the telephone corporation or its affiliate may lawfully provide.
Title
Facilitates access to telephone providers to deliver fiber-based services; permits telephone corporations to replace or supplement a telephone line or portion of a line with fiber optic facilities for purposes of providing any telephone, broadband, cable or other video service that the telephone corporation or its affiliate may lawfully provide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | approval memo.111 |
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.748 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-08 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-08 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1552 |
2021-06-08 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5868A |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.466 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.466 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7214a |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05868 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7214A