NY A07209 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - advanced to third reading cal.950
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - advanced to third reading cal.950
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Otsego to impose an additional mortgage recording tax of 25 cents per $100 of principal debt or obligation.
Title
Authorizes the county of Otsego to impose an additional mortgage recording tax of 25 cents per $100 of principal debt or obligation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.950 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | print number 7209a |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.550 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05364 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - PRINT NUMBER 5364A