NY A07207 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.747
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - signed chap.747
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to conduct a study on urban agriculture including, but not limited to, vertical farming, community gardens and urban farming.
Title
Authorizes and directs the commissioner of agriculture and markets to conduct a study on urban agriculture including, but not limited to, vertical farming, community gardens and urban farming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | Assembly | signed chap.747 |
2021-12-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1386 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5083A |
2021-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.227 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.227 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | print number 7207a |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to agriculture |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05134 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
S05083 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7207A
S05083 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7207A