NY A07199 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.223
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.223
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the suspension of service of state-operated individualized residential alternatives.
Title
Relates to the suspension of service of state-operated individualized residential alternatives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Mental Health Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.223 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.162 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a7199 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to mental health |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.738 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5315 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.162 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.162 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S05315 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.223