NY A07197 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires members of the state, county, city, village and town police, sheriff's departments, fire departments and emergency medical service providers to be trained in the administration of opioid antagonists.
Title
Requires members of the state, county, city, village and town police, sheriff's departments, fire departments and emergency medical service providers to be trained in the administration of opioid antagonists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | print number 7197a |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-04-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |