NY A07193 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - advanced to third reading cal.309
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits non-compete agreements and certain restrictive covenants which unreasonably and unfairly bar or inhibit post-employment competition and protects certain workers from inappropriate and unnecessary restrictions on future employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits non-compete agreements and certain restrictive covenants which unreasonably and unfairly bar or inhibit post-employment competition and protects certain workers from inappropriate and unnecessary restrictions on future employment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.309
2019-05-07Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-04-11Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S05790 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - REFERRED TO LABOR

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback