NY A07178 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designating the Eltingville transit center as the "Iraq War and Afghanistan War Veterans' Memorial Transit Center".
Title
Relates to designating the Eltingville transit center as the "Iraq War and Afghanistan War Veterans' Memorial Transit Center".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.266 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.266 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | print number 7178a |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04286 (Same As) 0000-00-00 -