NY A07177 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6194b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - substituted by s6194b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a 9-8-8 suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline system; provides crisis intervention services and crisis care coordination to individuals accessing the 9-8-8 suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline.
Title
Establishes a 9-8-8 suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline system; provides crisis intervention services and crisis care coordination to individuals accessing the 9-8-8 suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D] | Sen. Nathalia Fernandez [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6194b |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.793 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7177b |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | print number 7177a |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to mental health |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S06194 (Same As) 2021-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.145