NY A07175 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - substituted by s6362a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-03 - substituted by s6362a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the "COVID-19 Emergency Eviction and Foreclosure Prevention Act of 2020" and the "COVID-19 Emergency Protect Our Small Businesses Act of 2021" until August 31, 2021.
Title
Extends the "COVID-19 Emergency Eviction and Foreclosure Prevention Act of 2020" and the "COVID-19 Emergency Protect Our Small Businesses Act of 2021" until August 31, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6362a |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7175a |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.64 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.64 |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06362 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - SIGNED CHAP.104