NY A07164 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - print number 7164a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-25 - print number 7164a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a gun violence prevention program in the public schools; provides that the program is to be developed by the department of education in conjunction with other state agencies and educational organizations and is to be made available to schools for use in pre-kindergarten through twelfth grade; provides for a report to the governor and the legislature on the program; enacts the "gun violence prevention act".
Title
Provides for a gun violence prevention program in the public schools; provides that the program is to be developed by the department of education in conjunction with other state agencies and educational organizations and is to be made available to schools for use in pre-kindergarten through twelfth grade; provides for a report to the governor and the legislature on the program; enacts the "gun violence prevention act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | Assembly | print number 7164a |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01071 (Same As) 2016-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 1071A