NY A07158 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the release of personnel records or information contained therein of first responders; allows such release upon the authorization of the subject employee.
Title
Relates to the release of personnel records or information contained therein of first responders; allows such release upon the authorization of the subject employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.538 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.903 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4818 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.342 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.532 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.532 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04818 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7158