NY A07154 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a health care provider who administers an immunization to a person nineteen years of age or older to report such information to the department of health or to a regional health information organization unless such person objects to such reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires a health care provider who administers an immunization to a person nineteen years of age or older to report such information to the department of health or to a regional health information organization unless such person objects to such reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.199
2024-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2023-06-01SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2023-06-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-01Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.178
2023-05-17Assemblyrules report cal.178
2023-05-17Assemblyreported
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-11Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S01531 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback