NY A07153 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-14 - ordered to third reading rules cal.221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring insurance coverage for pre-exposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV and post-exposure prophylaxis to prevent HIV infection.
Title
Relates to requiring insurance coverage for pre-exposure prophylaxis for the prevention of HIV and post-exposure prophylaxis to prevent HIV infection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.221 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.221 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7153a |
2018-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S00043 (Same As) 2018-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 43A