NY A07150 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - print number 7150a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - print number 7150a
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates additional application fees and annual fees for special license plates issued to veterans of the armed forces of the United States.
Title
Eliminates additional application fees and annual fees for special license plates issued to veterans of the armed forces of the United States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Assembly | print number 7150a |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05434 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to transportation