NY A07146 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 7146a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - print number 7146a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the distribution of aid for high cost students with disabilities; provides financial support in the first year when a new high cost student with a disability moves into a school district during the school year with an individualized education program.
Title
Relates to the distribution of aid for high cost students with disabilities; provides financial support in the first year when a new high cost student with a disability moves into a school district during the school year with an individualized education program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | print number 7146a |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S00564 (Same As) 2018-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 564A