NY A07144 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the tax on receipts derived from removing waste from certain transfer stations or debris processing facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the tax on receipts derived from removing waste from certain transfer stations or debris processing facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-05Senatetabled
2012-10-03Senatevetoed memo.155
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1193
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S5235A
2012-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.472
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.472
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-18Assemblyprint number 7144b
2012-06-18Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2012-01-04Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2011-06-23Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-06-20Assemblyprint number 7144a
2011-06-20Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2011-04-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05235 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7144B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07144&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07144&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07144
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07144&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07144A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07144&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07144B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07144&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A7144#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback