NY A07129 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - substituted by s6919a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Putnam Valley, in Putnam county to adopt and amend local laws imposing a tax on persons occupying a room for hire in any hotel in an amount not to exceed 2% of the per diem rental rate for each room.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Putnam Valley, in Putnam county to adopt and amend local laws imposing a tax on persons occupying a room for hire in any hotel in an amount not to exceed 2% of the per diem rental rate for each room.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08Assemblysubstituted by s6919a
2023-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.730
2023-06-08Assemblyreported
2023-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-16Assemblyprint number 7129a
2023-05-16Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2023-05-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06919 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.339

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback