NY A07129 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-5)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - print number 7129a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - print number 7129a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to utilization review program standards; requires use of evidence-based and peer reviewed clinical review criteria; relates to prescription drug formulary changes and pre-authorization for certain health care services.
Title
Relates to utilization review program standards; requires use of evidence-based and peer reviewed clinical review criteria; relates to prescription drug formulary changes and pre-authorization for certain health care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Assembly | print number 7129a |
2022-01-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06435 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES