NY A07126 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s7031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - substituted by s7031
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions relating to a partial tax abatement for residential real property held in the cooperative or condominium form of ownership in a city having a population of one million or more.
Title
Extends certain provisions relating to a partial tax abatement for residential real property held in the cooperative or condominium form of ownership in a city having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s7031 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.362 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.362 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-23 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07031 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.184