NY A07118 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - signed chap.300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions allowing the county of Fulton to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions allowing the county of Fulton to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 115 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-23Assemblysigned chap.300
2023-08-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-07Senate3RD READING CAL.974
2023-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6761
2023-06-07SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-07Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.657
2023-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.657
2023-06-07Assemblyreported
2023-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06761 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7118

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback