NY A07118 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for recall of a statewide elective officer; empowers the citizens with the ability to remove elective officers.
Title
Provides for recall of a statewide elective officer; empowers the citizens with the ability to remove elective officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in election law |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | referred to election law |