NY A07114 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the attendance of minors upon full day instruction and the conditions under which districts are entitled to an apportionment of state aid.
Title
Relates to the attendance of minors upon full day instruction and the conditions under which districts are entitled to an apportionment of state aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.605 |
2019-11-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.550 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7114 |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.1056 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5757 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.550 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.550 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05757 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - SIGNED CHAP.605