NY A07108 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a utilization review of a request for nursing home care after an inpatient hospital admission to be completed within 24 hours of the request.
Title
Requires a utilization review of a request for nursing home care after an inpatient hospital admission to be completed within 24 hours of the request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2018-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.982 |
2018-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7871 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.695 |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07871 (Same As) 2018-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7108