NY A07106 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - signed chap.229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-14 - signed chap.229
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts brewers who produce less than 60,000 barrels of beer a year from the requirement to file annual information returns with the department of taxation and finance.
Title
Exempts brewers who produce less than 60,000 barrels of beer a year from the requirement to file annual information returns with the department of taxation and finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-14 | Senate | signed chap.229 |
2015-08-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4282 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.443 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04282 (Same As) 2015-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7106