NY A07105 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - advanced to third reading cal.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the use of drilling fluids and flowback water from wells, pools or fields on any highway for any purpose including but not limited to de-icing or dust suppression.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the use of drilling fluids and flowback water from wells, pools or fields on any highway for any purpose including but not limited to de-icing or dust suppression.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-07Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.348
2024-03-05Assemblyreported
2024-02-13Assemblyreported referred to codes
2024-02-08Assemblyprint number 7105a
2024-02-08Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation
2023-05-10Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S01538 (Same As) 2024-05-08 - referred to environmental conservation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback