NY A07092 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on September 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-12 - signed chap.295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the electronic distribution of rule making information.
Title
Relates to the electronic distribution of rule making information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-12 | Senate | signed chap.295 |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1797 |
2017-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5721 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.230 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.230 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05721 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7092