NY A07091 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2015 to November 30, 2017, the expiration of the authority of the county of Franklin to impose an additional 1% sales and compensating use tax.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2015 to November 30, 2017, the expiration of the authority of the county of Franklin to impose an additional 1% sales and compensating use tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4675 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.551 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.551 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04675 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.179