NY A07087 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to price gouging of medicine.
Title
Relates to price gouging of medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.498 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.242 |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S05262 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION