NY A07086 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-27 - print number 7086a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-27 - print number 7086a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program to provide early screening and intervention services for children with risk factors for dyslexia.
Title
Establishes a pilot program to provide early screening and intervention services for children with risk factors for dyslexia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Assembly | print number 7086a |
2018-04-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02767 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES