NY A07083 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 7083b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - print number 7083b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to therapy dogs for persons with a disability.
Title
Relates to therapy dogs for persons with a disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | print number 7083b |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | print number 7083a |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05080 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - referred to governmental operations