NY A07077 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Hearing: May 21 @ 1:30 pm in Room 630 LOB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Eliminates provisions exempting employees with disabilities from the minimum wage law; provides that laws or minimum wage orders that authorize an employer to pay a wage that is less than the minimum wage are valid provided that under such laws or orders an employee with a disability is paid the same wage as an employee in a comparable position that does not have a disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eliminates provisions exempting employees with disabilities from the minimum wage law; provides that laws or minimum wage orders that authorize an employer to pay a wage that is less than the minimum wage are valid provided that under such laws or orders an employee with a disability is paid the same wage as an employee in a comparable position that does not have a disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-09Assemblyprint number 7077a
2019-05-09Assemblyamend and recommit to labor
2019-04-04Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S04018 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - PRINT NUMBER 4018A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback