NY A07077 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates provisions exempting employees with disabilities from the minimum wage law; provides that laws or minimum wage orders that authorize an employer to pay a wage that is less than the minimum wage are valid provided that under such laws or orders an employee with a disability is paid the same wage as an employee in a comparable position that does not have a disability.
Title
Eliminates provisions exempting employees with disabilities from the minimum wage law; provides that laws or minimum wage orders that authorize an employer to pay a wage that is less than the minimum wage are valid provided that under such laws or orders an employee with a disability is paid the same wage as an employee in a comparable position that does not have a disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | print number 7077a |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04018 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR