NY A07071 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - held for consideration in higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - held for consideration in higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum tuition assistance program award; increases the maximum parental income amount.
Title
Increases the minimum tuition assistance program award; increases the maximum parental income amount.
Sponsors
Asm. Edward Ra [R] | Asm. Jodi Giglio [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Assembly | held for consideration in higher education |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | print number 7071a |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06062 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION