NY A07067 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to contingency planning by state agencies for extended federal government shutdowns; requires the secretary to oversee development of shutdown contingency plans.
Title
Relates to contingency planning by state agencies for extended federal government shutdowns; requires the secretary to oversee development of shutdown contingency plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | print number 7067a |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S05452 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE