NY A07052 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s6173b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s6173b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the state board of elections to join certain multistate voter list maintenance organizations and provide such organizations with certain voter information; requires the state to join a multistate voter list maintenance organization on or before July 31, 2025.
Title
Permits the state board of elections to join certain multistate voter list maintenance organizations and provide such organizations with certain voter information; requires the state to join a multistate voter list maintenance organization on or before July 31, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s6173b |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | rules report cal.392 |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | print number 7052c |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | print number 7052b |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | print number 7052a |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S06173 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - ordered to third reading rules cal.392