NY A07047 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to salary adjustments according to plan and step-ups or increments.
Title
Relates to salary adjustments according to plan and step-ups or increments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.209 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-22 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-22 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.361 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | substituted for a7047 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.398 |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | substituted by s5052 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.361 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S05052 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.209