NY A07034 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - substituted by s103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-16 - substituted by s103
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to administering tests to detect or screen for tuberculosis infections.
Title
Relates to administering tests to detect or screen for tuberculosis infections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Assembly | substituted by s103 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.372 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.372 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S00103 (Same As) 2015-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.464