NY A07021 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-03 - signed chap.563
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to state aid eligibility for library construction, and to streamline and modernize certain library aid formulas and program requirements.
Title
Relates to state aid eligibility for library construction, and to streamline and modernize certain library aid formulas and program requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D] | Asm. Josh Jensen [R] | Asm. Jennifer Lunsford [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. Michael Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Assembly | signed chap.563 |
2021-10-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1462 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6511 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.359 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.359 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S06511 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7021