NY A07019 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - signed chap.201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to permissible fees in connection with open end loans.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of certain provisions relating to permissible fees in connection with open end loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Assembly | signed chap.201 |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1152 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6444 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BANKS |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.274 |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S06444 (Same As) 2021-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7019