NY A07015 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-04 - print number 7015a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-04 - print number 7015a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive retiree status to former New York City public-school teacher Israel Baum.
Title
Grants retroactive retiree status to former New York City public-school teacher Israel Baum.
Sponsors
Asm. Dov Hikind [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-04 | Assembly | print number 7015a |
2016-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05755 (Same As) 2016-06-07 - referred to governmental employees