NY A07009 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the board of elections will mail special ballots to victims of domestic violence, whose statement is received by the board of elections not earlier than the thirtieth day nor later than the seventh day before the election.
Title
Provides that the board of elections will mail special ballots to victims of domestic violence, whose statement is received by the board of elections not earlier than the thirtieth day nor later than the seventh day before the election.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.492 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.358 |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05741 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS