NY A07004 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s6093a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-02 - substituted by s6093a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the effect and rebuttal of certain medical presumptions relating to heart disease; provides that, for certain members, any condition of impairment of health caused by a disease of the heart, resulting in disability, shall be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty and the natural and proximate result of an accident.
Title
Relates to the effect and rebuttal of certain medical presumptions relating to heart disease; provides that, for certain members, any condition of impairment of health caused by a disease of the heart, resulting in disability, shall be presumptive evidence that such disability was incurred in the performance and discharge of duty and the natural and proximate result of an accident.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] |
Asm. Patrick Burke [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s6093a |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.609 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-03-25 | Assembly | print number 7004a |
2022-03-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06093 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.123