NY A07001 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "gender identity respect, dignity and safety act"; relates to the treatment and placement of incarcerated people based upon gender identity; requires that incarcerated people in state and local correctional facilities who have a gender identity different from the person's assigned sex at birth be addressed and have access to commissary items, clothing and other materials that are consistent with the person's gender identity; establishes that incarcerated people shall be presumptively placed in a correctional facility with persons of the gender that most closely aligns with such person's self-attested gender identity unless the person opts out of such placement.
Title
Enacts the "gender identity respect, dignity and safety act"; relates to the treatment and placement of incarcerated people based upon gender identity; requires that incarcerated people in state and local correctional facilities who have a gender identity different from the person's assigned sex at birth be addressed and have access to commissary items, clothing and other materials that are consistent with the person's gender identity; establishes that incarcerated people shall be presumptively placed in a correctional facility with persons of the gender that most closely aligns with such person's self-attested gender identity unless the person opts out of such placement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | print number 7001b |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 7001a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S06677 (Same As) 2022-04-26 - PRINT NUMBER 6677A