NY A06996 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - signed chap.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to information to be provided by a veterinarian initially prescribing or dispensing a drug to a dog, cat, or rabbit; extends the effective date of such provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to information to be provided by a veterinarian initially prescribing or dispensing a drug to a dog, cat, or rabbit; extends the effective date of such provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30Assemblysigned chap.153
2023-06-29Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-07Senate3RD READING CAL.1722
2023-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7459
2023-06-01SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2023-06-01Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-01Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.467
2023-06-01Assemblyrules report cal.467
2023-06-01Assemblyreported
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-10Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S07459 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6996

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback